MA H1435 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the display of the flag of the United States by certain condominium owners. Housing.
Title
Relative to the display of the flag of the United States by condominium unit owners
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. Alyson Sullivan-Almeida [R] | Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R] |
Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. David Robertson [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-10-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3653 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1132 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2432 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1501 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1132 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S2432 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1501 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1435 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1435.pdf |