MA H3648 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2171
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt the personal use of milk and raw milk products by owners of cows and goats from certain laws governing the use of said products. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Authorizing owners to utilize products from cows or goats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2171 |
2015-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-07-02 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S2171 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, see S2258
H930 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H930 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3648 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3648.pdf |