MA H1129 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a homeless persons bill of rights. Housing.
Title
Providing a homeless bill of rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3595 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2016
H118 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1155 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
H143 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H118 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1155 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4310
H143 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
S1285 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1233 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1129 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1129.pdf |