MA H3637 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4651
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4651 |
2017-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2017 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S423 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2462
S1875 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H401 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H2117 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H1893 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S423 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2462
S1875 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H401 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H2117 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H1893 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4651 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3637 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3637.pdf |