MA S1875 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2498
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to local energy investment and infrastructure modernization. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to local energy investment and infrastructure modernization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2498 |
2017-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1861 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2498
S423 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2462
H3637 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1725 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H401 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H2117 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H1893 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S423 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2462
H3637 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1778 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1726 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H1105 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1725 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H401 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
H2117 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
H1893 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2498 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1875 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1875.pdf |