MA H2117 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4544
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a water infrastructure improvement fund to provide assistance to cities and towns for clean water and economic development. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to municipal assistance for clean water and economic development infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4544 |
2017-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2332 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Reprinted as amended, see S2347
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H1107 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H1758 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H388 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H3927 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
S2332 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Reprinted as amended, see S2347
H4544 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2117 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2117.pdf |