MA H1726 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the establishment of certain funds for the promotion of green infrastructure, so-called, and the reduction of greenhouse gas emissions. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote green infrastructure, reduce greenhouse gas emissions, and create jobs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13JointHearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1861 (Similar To) 2017-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H2586 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3917
S423 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall
H3543 (Similar To) 2017-06-06 - Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S477 (Similar To) 2017-06-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Global Warming and Climate Change
H1778 (Similar To) 2017-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1105 (Similar To) 2017-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1725 (Similar To) 2017-10-30 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H401 (Similar To) 2017-11-16 - Hearing scheduled for 11/29/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2117 (Similar To) 2017-10-23 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2017 from 12:00 PM-03:00 PM in Lenox Town Hall
H1893 (Similar To) 2017-11-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback