MA H3588 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to identifying, preserving and commemorating historic roadways in the Commonwealth. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to identify, preserve and commemorate historic roadways in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14HouseCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2022-02-24HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2022-01-20JointHearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4017 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2021
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2044 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback