MA H3548 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Text of an amendment, see H58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Text of an amendment, see H58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Text of an amendment, see H58 |
Same As/Similar To
H58 (Replaced by) 2023-03-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2023
H4104 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2023
H57 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Published as amended, see H58
H4104 (Similar To) 2023-10-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2023
H57 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Published as amended, see H58
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3548.pdf |