MA H47 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Reported, in part, by H57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Reported, in part, by H57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2023 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Reported, in part, by H57 |
2023-02-01 | House | Transferred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the temporary committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H57 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Published as amended, see H58
H58 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Laid before the Governor
H3545 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H58 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Laid before the Governor
H3545 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H47 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H47.pdf |