MA H3528 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5042
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to possession and consumption of marijuana or marijuana accessories. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to possession and consumption of marijuana or marijuana accessories
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5042 |
2019-11-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2067 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2067 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H5042 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3528 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3528.pdf |