MA S2067 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to driver education. Transportation.
Title
Relative to driver education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2558 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied S2558 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H903 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1196 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1018 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3062 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S2558 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2067 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2067.pdf |