MA H3509 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Registry of Motor Vehicles to issue distinctive registration plates for Medal of Liberty recipients. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a distinctive registration plate for Medal of Liberty recipients

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-20JointHearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H3529 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3682 (Similar To) 2021-08-31 - Hearing scheduled for 09/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2362 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
S2327 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback