MA S2327 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2642
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide distinctive registration plates for certain veterans who participated in the testing of atomic weapons. Transportation.
Title
Providing for distinctive registration plates for certain veterans who participated in the testing of atomic weapons
Sponsors
Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2642 |
2022-01-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S2455 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2362 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2112 (Similar To) 2022-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2401 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2680
S2398 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2408 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1692 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2421 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2642 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2362 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2642
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2327 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2327.pdf |