MA H3506 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to marijuana cultivators. Marijuana Policy.
Title
For public safety in regards to homegrown marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1904 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
S1470 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S972 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S1377 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2501 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
H1437 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2532 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2037 (Similar To) 2017-03-03 - See H68
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3506 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3506.pdf |