MA H3464 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regulating the traffic utilization of Route 60 in the town of Arlington and the city of Medford. Transportation.
Title
Regulating the traffic utilization of Route 60 in the town of Arlington and the city of Medford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4966 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3455 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied H3496
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2273 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2636
S1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S2278 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3423 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
H3493 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3497 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5005
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2258 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2273 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2636
S1545 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S2278 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2682
H4966 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3464 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3464.pdf |