MA H3414 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H1894
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Accompanied H1894
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-26 - Accompanied H1894
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to carriers of property by motor vehicle. Transportation.
Title
Relative to carriers of property by motor vehicle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Accompanied H1894 |
2017-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1605 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1641 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1894 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3787 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4248
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
H1608 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1610 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1641 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H1894 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3787 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H4248
S2160 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
H3903 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H35 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4785
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2124 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - Reprinted as amended, see S2135
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4258 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4389
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
S2670 (Similar To) 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
H4978 (Similar To) 2018-12-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4998
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3414 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3414.pdf |