MA S2160 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - New draft substituted, see S2364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation relative to solar and wind property tax exemptions,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2160).
Title
Relative to clarifying property tax exemptions for solar and wind systems
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2364 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Read second |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2370 |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2017-09-18 | Senate | New draft of S1613 and S1615 |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1613 (Replaces) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2160
H1487 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3310 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
H3697 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
S2370 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Motion to lay upon the table prevailed
S2364 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1487 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3310 (Similar To) 2017-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3906
H3697 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4215
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
S2370 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Motion to lay upon the table prevailed
S2364 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2160 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2160.pdf |