MA H330 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish licensing standards for drain cleaners. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To establish licensing standards for drain cleaners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H330 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H330.pdf |