MA H3285 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4577
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4577
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4577
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to allow municipalities to finance expanded transit options. Transportation.
Title
To allow municipalities to finance expanded transit options
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4577 |
2024-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4577 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4788 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2827 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4997 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4577 (Replaced by) 2024-05-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4788 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2827 (Similar To) 2024-07-15 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4997 (Similar To) 2024-08-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3285 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3285.pdf |