MA H3276 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4654

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish paid parental leave for public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish parental leave for public employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4654
2018-01-17JointHearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1452 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback