MA H324 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require school attendance up to age eighteen or until graduation. Education.
Title
To require school attendance up to age eighteen or until graduation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4011 |
2015-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4011 (Replaced by) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4734 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 451 of the Acts of 2016
H323 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H807 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1211 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1212 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H324 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H324.pdf |