MA H3226 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4623
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4623
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to pre-hospital care protocols related to the assessment, treatment and transport of stroke patients. Public Health.
Title
Relative to timely care and saving lives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4623 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4623 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Senate concurred
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4623 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3226.pdf |