MA H3186 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city known as the town of Greenfield be authorized to issue an additional license for the sale of all alcohol beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city known as the town of Greenfield to grant an additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-06-15 | House | Enacted |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read and, placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2015-04-30 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2015-04-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-04-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3186 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3186.pdf |