MA H3155 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Straus of Mattapoisett, a petition of William M. Straus that the Registrar of Motor Vehicles be authorized to issue amateur radio operator license plates. Transportation.
Title
Relative to amateur radio operator license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4546 |
2020-01-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3003 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2041 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3049 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2041 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2105 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2559
H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3155 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3155.pdf |