MA H3136 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to OSHA trained employees in the workplace. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
To require employers to employed individuals to be trained in OSHA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-31 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H2545 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4556 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - See H1390
S1427 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1637 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H1037 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4386
H56 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1442 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H226 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Chapter 160 of the Acts of 2018
H1698 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1723 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1371 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H31 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H32 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4556 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - See H1390
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3136.pdf |