MA H3106 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4874
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expedite the reunification of children under temporary custody with family members. The Judiciary.
Title
To accelerate a child’s reunification with family members
Sponsors
Rep. Joan Meschino [D] | Rep. Juana Matias [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4874 |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
H2800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3105 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H47 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1175 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2555
H2800 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3105 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H47 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3106 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3106.pdf |