MA H47 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2500
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Commission on Uniform State Laws (House, No. 42) as relates to the Uniform Child-Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the Uniform Child-Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2500 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-06 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 21, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2879 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H1282 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1150 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3051 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2500 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
H1282 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1150 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1347 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H53 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3051 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2500 (Replaced by) 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H47 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H47.pdf |