MA S2500 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S806
Note: Legislation replaced by S2618
Note: Legislation replaced by S2618
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2618
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act; of the Commission on Uniform State Laws as relates to the Uniform Child-Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act; and (subject to Joint Rule 12) of James M. Cantwell relative to the child custody jurisdiction and enforcement,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2500).
Title
Relative to the Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2618 |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Read second |
2018-07-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2618 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-04-30 | Senate | New draft of S806, H47 and H3729 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported from the committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S806 (Replaces) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1145 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2618 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1145 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2618 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2500.pdf |