MA H2930 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4278
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Kocot of Northampton, a petition of Peter V. Kocot and Geoff Diehl that the commissioner of the Division of Energy Resources be authorized to convene a working group to study the reduction of contaminants in wood pellet fuel. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to wood pellet fuel
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Kocot [D] | Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4278 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3955 (Similar To) 2017-11-13 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H4278 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4278 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2930 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2930.pdf |