MA H2911 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-08-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tow lien reform. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to tow lien reform
Sponsors
Rep. David Nangle [D] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] |
Sen. Barry Finegold [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-08-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-08-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-08-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H487 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S974 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1371 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H664 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H137 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S411 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H380 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
H487 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S974 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1371 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H664 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H137 (Similar To) 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S411 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2544
S2220 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H4083 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2911 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2911.pdf |