MA H2826 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-6)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to transparency in private utility construction contracts

Sponsors

Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]
Rep. Christopher Markey [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]
Rep. Stephan Hay [D]Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Alice Peisch [D]
Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Rep. Angelo Scaccia [D]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]Rep. David Decoste [R]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Joseph Wagner [D]
Rep. Harold Naughton [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Kate Hogan [D]
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]
Sen. Michael Brady [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]
Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-07-02JointHearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy

Same As/Similar To

S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback