MA H2809 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase the use of zero emission vehicles in the Commonwealth. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To increase the use of zero emission vehicles in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 4, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2873 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H2668 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H3002 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3385 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2072 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2119 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H359 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2993 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3007 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2112 (Similar To) 2019-09-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3270 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1529 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1087 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4810
S2113 (Similar To) 2020-12-10 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H2873 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2809 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2809.pdf |