MA H2786 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5103
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Massachusetts Historical Commission. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
To increase the transparency of the Massachusetts Historical Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Silvia [D] | Rep. Paul Schmid [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Rep. Jon Santiago [D] |
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5103 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1062 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2847 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H265 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1152 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H2847 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2627 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H265 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2768 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
S544 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S1677 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
H253 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2289 (Similar To) 2020-12-16 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Reported by H4210
H4210 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 124 of the Acts of 2019
H5103 (Replaced by) 2020-11-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2786 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2786.pdf |