MA H265 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-23 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require transparency in solicitations via telephone and similar devices. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring transparency in telephone solicitations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-23JointHearing rescheduled to 10/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H668 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H666 (Similar To) 2019-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H249 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H93 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H253 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1062 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1152 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H2847 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2786 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2627 (Similar To) 2019-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H2768 (Similar To) 2019-06-05 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
S544 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S656 (Similar To) 2019-05-30 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/06/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in 222
S960 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1677 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2289 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - House concurred
S2295 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied H913
H4012 (Similar To) 2019-10-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2368

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback