MA H2758 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4346
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the accessibility determination for “The Ride” services of the Massachusetts Bay Transportation Authority. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the eligibility determination for ‘THE RIDE’ Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4346 |
2018-01-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 1:00PM-5:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H1873 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1833 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1901 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4346 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1876 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1833 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H2675 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1901 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H3882 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4346 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2758 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2758.pdf |