MA H2740 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing credible service for retirement purposes for VISTA volunteers. Public Service.
Title
Relative to credible service for VISTA volunteers
Sponsors
Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Michael Soter [R] | Rep. David Robertson [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-01-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2740 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2740.pdf |