MA H2729 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require executive agencies to post relevant Code of Massachusetts Regulations (CMR) on agency websites. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to the online posting of CMRs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2729 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2729.pdf |