MA H272 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize pub brewers to sell at retail certain malt beverages and products on Sundays and legal holidays. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing pub brewer self distribution and sales on Sundays

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5043
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H210 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H314 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H268 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H235 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H5043 (Replaced by) 2020-10-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback