MA H2717 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a fund for the creation, acquisition, conservation and maintenance of public art and the creation of a public art commission. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To establish a Massachusetts percent for arts program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1385 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1289 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
H4741 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz-DiDomenico-O'Connor), in concurrence
S2616 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
H4922 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S160 (Similar To) 2017-05-09 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S164 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
S752 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H608 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H1182 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1255 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1907 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1314 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H380 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S1173 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1289 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H25 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H4098 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Resolves of 2018
S2149 (Similar To) -
S2254 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2344 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Reprinted as amended, see S2373
H4639 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Committee of conference appointed (Welch-Lewis-Tarr), in concurrence
H4741 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Committee of conference appointed (Chang-Diaz-DiDomenico-O'Connor), in concurrence
S2616 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2658 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
H4922 (Similar To) 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
H4962 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Resolve passed and laid before the Governor
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2717 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2717.pdf |