MA S2658 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adding a fifth member to the Board of Elections Commission in the City of Everett

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding a fifth member to the Board of Elections Commission in the City of Everett

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
2018-11-29SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-11-29HouseEnacted
2018-11-26HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-09-24HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-09-24HouseRules suspended
2018-09-24HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-08-27HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-08-23SenatePassed to be engrossed
2018-08-23SenateSubstituted for S2515
2018-08-23SenateRecommended new draft (DiDomenico) for S2515

Same As/Similar To

H4703 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 287 of the Acts of 2018
S2514 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 308 of the Acts of 2018
S2515 (Similar To) 2018-08-23 - New draft substituted, see S2658
S2516 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 314 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback