MA S2515 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2658
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - New draft substituted, see S2658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - New draft substituted, see S2658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to add a fifth member to the Board of Elections Commission in the City of Everett. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Adding a fifth member to the Board of Elections Commission in the City of Everett
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2658 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-05-29 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2018-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-10 | House | House concurred |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2514 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 308 of the Acts of 2018
S2516 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 314 of the Acts of 2018
H4703 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 287 of the Acts of 2018
S2658 (Replaced by) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
S2516 (Similar To) 2018-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 314 of the Acts of 2018
H4703 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 287 of the Acts of 2018
S2658 (Replaced by) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 316 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2515 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2515.pdf |