MA H4922 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4543
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on January 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve reviving and further continuing the special commission established to investigate and report on the preservation of Polish culture and history in the Pioneer Valley.
Title
Resolve reviving and further continuing the special commission established to investigate and report on the preservation of Polish culture and history in the Pioneer Valley.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Resolves of 2018 | |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Resolve passed and laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | House | Resolve passed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-10-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-10-04 | House | Ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-04 | House | New draft of H4543 |
2018-10-04 | House | Pending new draft of H4543 |
2018-10-04 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4543 (Replaces) 2018-10-04 - New draft substituted, see H4922
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1944 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4922 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4922.pdf |