MA H271 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to study and determine best practices to ensure the safety of blind persons. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to studying best practices for ensuring the safety of blind persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-02-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S2436 (Similar To) 2022-12-22 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1640 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1580 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3868 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5240
H4119 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H4122 (Similar To) 2021-09-22 - Adopted
S725 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1524 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1640 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1603 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2766
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1615 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1613 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1093 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S1580 (Similar To) 2022-06-28 - Accompanied H2418
S98 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
S100 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2627
S937 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S1612 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
S3082 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5224 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H271 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H271.pdf |