MA H2699 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to timely payments for work not included in public construction contracts. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to timely public payments for work not included in original construction contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/26/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2725 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2773 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
S1890 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2725 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1678 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2773 (Similar To) 2020-11-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5103
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
S1890 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2372 (Similar To) 2019-10-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2699 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2699.pdf |