MA H2697 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4639

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to sales tax exemptions for certain works of art. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sales tax exemption for the sale of art

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-26HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4639
2015-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2845 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1652 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H505 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H506 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2692 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H4744 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 429 of the Acts of 2016
H4745 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 430 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback