MA H2696 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5206
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to retirement and pensions during the COVID 19 pandemic. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Massachusetts General Laws chapter 32: retirement and pensions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5206 |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/21/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3757 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5451
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4105 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1674 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S653 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1737 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H3758 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5452
H3759 (Similar To) 2022-12-29 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, see H5453
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
H4105 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1674 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
S1773 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S653 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1690 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1703 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1693 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1738 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1737 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2751
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H5206 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2796 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2798 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H2637 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2696 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2696.pdf |