MA S1769 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2679
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to creditable service for retirement purposes for non-public school service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to non-public school service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2679 |
2021-08-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/01/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2640 (Similar To) 2021-06-03 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/09/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S653 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1792 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H2666 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
H4007 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2021
H4048 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4007
S2539 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2576 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S428 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
H2611 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5020
H2553 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S653 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1792 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1791 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2783
S1751 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Accompanied H2682
S1707 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H4443 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2022
S2679 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H5149 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Pocket veto
H2666 (Similar To) 2021-06-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3853
H2727 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1769.pdf |