MA H2683 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to honoring the founding of the United States Army, the United States Air Force and the National Guard. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to honoring the founding of the United States Army, the United States Air Force, and the National Guard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-02-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2683.pdf |