MA H2651 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to tax withholding for individual retirement accounts. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax withholding for individual retirement accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4639 |
2015-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4639 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
H460 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H454 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H458 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S250
H452 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H4749 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 413 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2651 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2651.pdf |